Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1451
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1451
Vide 18-1477
Title:National Review, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Michael E. Mann
Docketed:May 21, 2019
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
   Case Numbers:(14-CV-126)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 1, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 20, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019Waiver of right of respondent Michael E. Mann to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 05 2019Response Requested. (Due July 5, 2019)
Jun 12 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Mark Steyn filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Jun 21 2019Certificate of Word Compliance filed with respect to brief of amicus curiae brief of Judicial Watch.
Main Document
Jun 21 2019Affidavit of Service filed with respect to brief of amicus curiae of Judicial Watch.
Main Document
Jun 28 2019Brief of respondent Michael E. Mann in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Judith A. Curry filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of 21 U.S. Senators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2019Brief amici curiae of Former United States Attorneys General filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2019Brief amicus curiae of Stephen McIntyre filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 05 2019Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2019Reply of petitioner National Review, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 26 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 08 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 17 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 28 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 25 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Nov 25 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Alito, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: National Review, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
John B. Williams
    Counsel of Record
1200 New Hampshire Ave., N.W., Ste. 750
Washington, DC 20036

jbwilliams@williamslopatto.com
2022961611
Party name: Michael E. Mann
Other
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530
Sacramento, CA 95814

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Cato Institute, Reason Foundation, and the Individual Rights Foundation
Jonathan F. Cohn
    Counsel of Record
Sidlet Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jfcohn@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: 21 U.S. Senators
Scott A. Keller V
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

scott.keller@bakerbotts.com
2026397837
Party name: Former United States Attorneys General
Daniel J. Kornstein
    Counsel of Record
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP
600 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10020

dkornstein@ecbalaw.com
(212) 763-5000
Party name: Mark Steyn
Harry W. MacDougald
    Counsel of Record
Caldwell, Propst & DeLoach, LLP
Two Ravinia Dr.
Suite 1600
Atlanta, GA 30328

hmacdougald@cpdlawyers.com
404-843-1956
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
T. Russell Nobile
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rnobile@judicialwatch.org
(202) 646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202)546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Patrick Strawbridge
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
Ten Post Office Square
8th Floor South PMB #706
Boston, MA 02109

patrick@consovoymccarthy.com
617-227-0548
Party name: Stephen McIntyre
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

john.vecchione@causeofaction.org
202-499-4232
Party name: DR. JUDITH A. CURRY

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543