Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1447
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1447
Title:Republic of Hungary, et al., Petitioners
v.
Rosalie Simon, et al.
Docketed:May 20, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7146)
   Decision Date:December 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 15, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 19, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 19, 2019 to July 23, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 23, 2019.
Jul 23 2019Brief of respondents Simon, Rosalie, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 06 2019Reply of petitioners Republic of Hungary, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 19 2019Rescheduled.
Dec 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/17/2020.
Jan 21 2020The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 26 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Simon, Rosalie, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2020Supplemental brief of petitioners Republic of Hungary, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 09 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/25/2020.
Jun 29 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2020.
Jul 02 2020Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jul 28 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 30 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 4, 2020. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2020.
Jul 30 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Simon, Rosalie, et al.
Blanket Consent
Aug 04 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Republic of Hungary, et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 04 2020Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 04 2020Brief of petitioners Republic of Hungary, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Samuel Estreicher And Thomas H. Lee in support of neither party filed (also in 19-351). VIDED
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Societe Nationale SNCF SA in support of neither party filed (also in 19-351). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2020Proposal of petitioners to lodge non-record materials pursuant to Sup. Ct. R. 32.3 filed.
Main Document
Sep 11 2020Motion of Davis R. Robinson, Abraham D. Sofaer, David P. Stewart, and Edwin Williamson to Consider Brief of Amici Curiae Filed By Movants in Germany v. Phillip, No. 19-351 as an Amici Curiae Brief in This Case filed by Davis R. Robinson, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 16 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 7, 2020.
Oct 08 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit.
Oct 19 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. D.C. Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, some of the record has been electronically filed.
Oct 22 2020Brief of respondents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2020CIRCULATED
Oct 27 2020Brief amicus curiae of Former State Department Attorney Mark B. Feldman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2020Brief amici curiae of The 1939 Society, et al. filed (also in 19-351). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Members of the United States House of Representatives filed (also in 19-351). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Professor William S. Dodge and Professor Maggie Gardner filed (also in 19-351). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of The World Jewish Congress, Commission for Art Recovery, and Ambassador Ronald S. Lauder filed (also in 19-351) VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists and other adovcates for Holocaust restitution filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Victims of the Hungarian Holocaust filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Raoul Wallenberg Centre for Human Rights and Professor Irwin Cotler filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2020Brief amici curiae of Holocaust Survivors Foundation, USA, Inc., et al. (also in 19-351) filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2020Proposal of amici curiae the World Jewish Congress, Commission for Art Recovery, and Ambassador Ronald S. Lauder to lodge materials under Rule 32.3 filed.
Main Document
Nov 09 2020Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 23 2020Reply of petitioners Republic of Hungary, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2020Argued. For petitioners: Gregory Silbert, New York, N. Y.; and Benjamin W. Snyder, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Sarah E. Harrington, Bethesda, Md.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory Silbert
    Counsel of Record
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

gregory.silbert@weil.com
(212) 310 8000
Party name: Republic of Hungary, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Simon, Rosalie, et al.
Other
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
John Bellinger Bellinger III
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.bellinger@arnoldporter.com
202-942-6599
Party name: Societe Nationale SNCF SA
Samuel J. Dubbin
    Counsel of Record
Dubbin & Kravetz, LLP
1200 Anastasia Ave., #300
Coral Gables, FL 33134

sdubbin@dubbinkravetz.com
305 815-8060
Party name: Holocaust Survivors Foundation, USA, Inc., Renee Firestone, David Mermelstein, David Schaecter, Klaire Firestone, Thomas Weiss, M.D., And Naomi Vilko, M.D.
Mark B. Feldman
    Counsel of Record
Attorney At Law
2800 Mckinley Place NW
Washington, DC 20015

markfeld4@gmail.com
(202) 321-2690
Party name: Former State Department Attorney Mark B. Feldman
Beth Heifetz
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

bheifetz@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Raoul Wallenberg Centre for Human Rights and Professor Irwin Cotler
James Harold Hulme
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5342

james.hulme@arentfox.com
2028576144
Party name: Davis R. Robinson, et al.
Thomas Russell Kline
    Counsel of Record
Cultural Heritage Partners, PLLC
2101 L Street, NW Suite 800
Washington, DC 20037

tom@culturalheritagepartners.com
(202) 567-7594
Party name: The World Jewish Congress, Commission for Art Recovery, and Ambassador Ronald S. Lauder
Geoffrey Morris Klineberg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

gklineberg@kellogghansen.com
2023267928
Party name: Professor William S. Dodge and Professor Maggie Gardner
Robert J. Pavich
    Counsel of Record
Pavich Law Group, P.C.
30 West Monroe Street, Suite 1310
Chicago, IL 60603

rpavich@pavichlawgroup.com
3126908400
Party name: Victims of the Hungarian Holocaust
Amelia Lynn Borrego Sargent
    Counsel of Record
Willenken LLP
707 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 3850
Los Angeles, CA 90017

asargent@willenken.com
2139559240
Party name: Professors Samuel Estreicher And Thomas H. Lee
Akiva Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

ashapiro@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: Members of the United States House of Representatives
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angles, CA 90067-3119

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: The 1939 Society, Michael Bazyler, Bet Tzedek, Center for the Study of Law & Genocide at LMU Loyola Law School, and The Holocaust Education Center in the Desert, Inc. d/b/a Tolerance Education Center
Arthur Richter Traldi
    Counsel of Record
Andreozzi & Foote
4503 N. Front Street
Harrisburg, PA 18042

traldilaw2018@gmail.com
6104287179
Party name: American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists and other adovcates for Holocaust restitution

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543