Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1441
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1441
Title:Presbyterian Church U.S.A., Petitioner
v.
Brian Edwards, Judge, Jefferson Circuit Court, et al.
Docketed:May 17, 2019
Linked with 18A1126
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kentucky
   Case Numbers:(2016-SC-000699-MR)
   Decision Date:September 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 14, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2019Application (18A1126) for a stay pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 06 2019Application (18A1126) denied by Justice Sotomayor.
May 08 2019Application (18A1126) refiled and submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestWritten RequestWritten RequestWritten RequestWritten RequestWritten RequestWritten RequestWritten Request
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 14 2019Application (18A1126) referred to the Court.
May 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 17, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Application (18A1126) denied by the Court.
Jun 13 2019Brief of respondent Reverend Eric Hoey in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2019Reply of Presbyterian Church (U.S.A.) not accepted for filing. (July 02, 2019 -- Corrected version submitted)
Jul 01 2019Reply of petitioner Presbyterian Church (U.S.A.) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alexander Dushku
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
60 East South Temple
Suite 1800
Salt Lake City, UT 84145

adushku@kmclaw.com
8015405428
Party name: Presbyterian Church (U.S.A.)
Attorneys for Respondents
Roger Dale WarrenR. Dale Warren
600 W. Main St. Suite 300
Louisville, KY KY

dwarren@600mainlaw.com
5025896190
Party name: Reverend Eric Hoey

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543