Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1437
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1437
Title:Winston & Strawn LLP, Petitioner
v.
Constance Ramos, et al.
Docketed:May 16, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A153390)
   Decision Date:November 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 13, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
May 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 17, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 17, 2019 to July 17, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 17, 2019.
Jun 10 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Winston & Strawn LLP.
Blanket Consent
Jun 11 2019Letter of consent to the filing of amicus briefs from respondents Constance Ramos, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 12 2019Letter of consent to the filing of amicus briefs from respondent Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco .
Jun 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Ropes & Gray LLP filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2019Brief amici curiae of Civil Justice Association of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Atlantuc Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 17, 2019 to July 31, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 31, 2019.
Jul 31 2019Brief of respondents Constance Ramos, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 13 2019Reply of petitioner Winston & Strawn LLP filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Winston & Strawn LLP
Attorneys for Respondents
Karla Ann Gilbride
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice, P.C.
1620 L St. NW, Ste. 630
Washington, DC 20036

kgilbride@publicjustice.net
2028615241
Party name: Constance Ramos, et al.
Other
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Ropes & Gray LLP
Fred J. Hiestand
    Counsel of Record
Fred J. Hiestand, A Professional Corporation
3418 3rd Avenue, Suite 1
Sacramento, CA 95817

fred@fjh-law.com
9164485100
Party name: Civil Justice Association of California
Martin Sander Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
914.834.3322
Party name: Atlantuc Legal Foundation
Matthew T. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross and Judd LLP
111 Lyon Street, NW
900 Fifth Third Center
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

mnelson@wnj.com
(616) 752-2539
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Rae Thiesfield Vann
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, N.W.
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

rvann@ntlakis.com
2026295600
Party name: CENTER for WORKPLACE COMPLIANCE

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543