Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1431
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1431
Title:Frank G., Petitioner
v.
Renee P.-F., et al.
Docketed:May 15, 2019
Linked with 18A818
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, Second Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(2017-01579, 2017-01584, 2017-06311, 2017-08729)
   Decision Date:May 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 11, 2018

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 05 2019Application (18A818) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 11, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 11 2019Application (18A818) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 10, 2019.
May 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 13 2019Waiver of right of respondent The Children to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 14 2019Amicus brief of Marriage Law Foundation not accepted for filing. (June 17, 2019) (Duplicate submission)
Jun 14 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Adam J. MacLeod.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New Yorkers for Constitutional Freedoms, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Marriage Law Foundation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Them Before Us.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by New Yorkers for Constitutional Freedoms, et al. GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Marriage Law Foundation GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Adam J. MacLeod GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Them Before Us GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Frank G.
Attorneys for Respondents
Gloria Maria Marchetti-Bruck
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Gloria Marchetti-Bruck
445 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 1102
White Plains, NY 10601

gmbruckesq@aol.com
914-330-6388
Party name: The Children
Other
David R. Langdon
    Counsel of Record
Langdon Law, LLC
8913 Cincinnati-Dayton Road
West Chester, OH 45069

dlangdon@langdonlaw.com
5135777380
Party name: Adam J. MacLeod
Charles S. LiMandri
    Counsel of Record
Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund
P.O. Box 9520
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

cslimandri@limandri.com
858-759-9948
Party name: Them Before Us
Monte Neil Stewart
    Counsel of Record
1931 Highway 241
Afton, WY 83110

monteneilstewart@gmail.com
2085146360
Party name: Marriage Law Foundation
David Robert Upham
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of David R. Upham
1845 E. Northgate Drive
Irving, TX 75062

davidrupham@yahoo.com
972-721-5186
Party name: New Yorkers for Constitutional Freedoms, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543