Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1429
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1429
Title:Stahl York Ave. Co., LLC, Petitioner
v.
City of New York, New York, et al.
Docketed:May 14, 2019
Linked with 18A842
Lower Ct:Appellate Division, Supreme Court of New York, First Judicial Department
   Case Numbers:(5441)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 13, 2018

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2019Application (18A842) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 13, 2019 to April 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2019Application (18A842) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until April 12, 2019.
Apr 02 2019Application (18A842) to extend further the time from April 12, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Written RequestProof of Service
Apr 05 2019Application (18A842) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 10, 2019.
May 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 13, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Waiver of right of respondents City of New York, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Home Builders of the United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alexandra Anastasia Ekaterina Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Shapiro Arato Bach LLP
500 Fifth Avenue
40th Floor
New York, NY 10110

ashapiro@shapiroarato.com
212-257-4880
Party name: Stahl York Avenue Co., LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Aaron M. BloomZachary W. Carter, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
New York City of Law
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

(212) 356-2274
Party name: City of New York, et al.
Other
Amy Christine Chai
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

achai@nahb.org
2022668232
Party name: National Association of Home Builders of the United States
Glenn Evans Roper
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
1745 Shea Center Drive, Suite 400
Highlands Ranch, CO 80129

GERoper@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543