Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1415
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1415
Title:ASARCO LLC, Petitioner
v.
United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO, CLC
Docketed:May 10, 2019
Linked with 18A994
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16363)
   Decision Date:December 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 27 2019Application (18A994) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 10, 2019 to May 10, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2019Application (18A994) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 10, 2019.
May 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2019 to July 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 10, 2019.
Jul 10 2019Brief of respondent United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manfacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union AFL-CIO, CLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 24 2019Reply of petitioner ASARCO, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rex S. Heinke
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 600
Los Angeles, CA 90067

rheinke@akingump.com
3102291000
Party name: ASARCO, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael David Weiner
    Counsel of Record
Gilbert & Sackman, a Law Corporation
3699 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90010-2732

mweiner@gslaw.org
323-938-3000
Party name: United Steel etc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543