Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1368
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1368
Title:San Diego Gas & Electric Company, Petitioner
v.
California Public Utilities Commission
Docketed:May 1, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Fourth Appellate District, Division One
   Case Numbers:(D074417)
   Decision Date:November 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 30, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2019Waiver of right of respondent Public Utilities Commission of the State of California to respond filed.
Main Document
May 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent The Protect Our Communities Foundation to respond filed.
Main Document
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
May 30 2019Response Requested. (Due July 1, 2019)
May 30 2019Waiver of right of respondent Public Utilities Commission of the State of California to respond filed.
Main Document
May 30 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Edison Electric Institute.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Shareholders in California Investor-Owned Utilities.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2019Brief of respondent Ruth Henricks in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 30 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Southern California Edison Company.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2019 to July 31, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 31, 2019, for all respondents.
Jul 26 2019Brief of respondent California Public Utilities Commission in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 31 2019Brief of respondent The Protect Our Communities Foundation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Reply of petitioner San Diego Gas & Electric Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Southern California Edison Company GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Edison Electric Institute GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Shareholders in California Investor-Owned Utilities GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: San Diego Gas & Electric Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael J. Aguirre
    Counsel of Record
Aguirre & Severson, LLP
501 W. Broadway
Suite 1050
San Diego, CA 92101

maguirre@amslawyers.com
6198765364
Party name: Ruth Henricks
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Public Utilities Commission of the State of California
Matthew D. Zinn
    Counsel of Record
Shute, Mihaly & Weinberger LLP
396 Hayes St.
San Francisco, CA 94102

zinn@smwlaw.com
415-552-7272
Party name: The Protect Our Communities Foundation
Catherine C. EngbergShute, Mihaly & Weinberger, LLP
396 Hayes Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

415-552-7272
Party name: The Protect Our Communities Foundation
Christine Jun HammondCalifornia Public Utilities Commission
505 Van Ness Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94102

christine.hammond@cpuc.ca.gov
415-703-2682
Party name: Public Utilities Commission of the State of California
Other
John Charles Hueston
    Counsel of Record
Hueston Hennigan LLP
523 West 6th Street, Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90014

jhueston@hueston.com
213-788-4340
Party name: Southern California Edison Company
Ilana Beth Gelfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
100 High Street
Boston, MA 02110

igelfman@jonesday.com
(617) 960-3939
Party name: Shareholders in California Investor-Owned Utilities
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: Edison Electric Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543