Docket for 18-1362
|
Mar 04 2019 | Application (18A909) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 13, 2019 to May 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main Document | Mar 08 2019 | Application (18A909) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 12, 2019. | | | Apr 29 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 30, 2019) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | May 08 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 30, 2019 to June 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 14 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2019. | | | May 29 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of The Coalition for Free and Open Elections filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jun 13 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2019 to July 31, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 19 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 31, 2019. | | | Jul 31 2019 | Brief of respondent Secretary, State of Alabama in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Aug 14 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. | | | Aug 14 2019 | Reply of petitioner James Hall filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 07 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|