Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1317
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1317
Title:American Institute for International Steel, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:April 17, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1727)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due May 17, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, American Institute for International Steel, et al.
Blanket ConsentBlanket Consent
May 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 17, 2019 to May 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 28, 2019.
May 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of Basrai Farms filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Foreign Trade Council filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
May 29 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
May 31 2019Reply of petitioners American Institute for International Steel, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: American Institute for International Steel, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Other
Keith Bradley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP
1801 California Street, Suite 4900
Denver, CO 80202

keith.bradley@squirepb.com
303-830-1776
Party name: National Foreign Trade Council
Jeffrey Sheldon Grimson
    Counsel of Record
Mowry & Grimson, PLLC
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW
Suite 810
Washington, DC 20015

jsg@mowrygrimson.com
12026883610
Party name: Basrai Farms
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543