Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1309
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1309
Vide 19-46
Title:Booking.com B.V., Petitioner
v.
United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.
Docketed:April 16, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2458, 17-2459)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:April 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 16, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief of respondents United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Association of Amicus Counsel filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New York Intellectual Property Law Association.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2019Reply of petitioner Booking.com B.V. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan E. Moskin
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LL P
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

jmoskin@foley.com
212-682-7474
Party name: Booking.com B.V.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Patent and Trademark Office, et al.
Other
Theodore H. Davis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick & Cody
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com
4048156534
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Charles Robert Macedo
    Counsel of Record
Amster, Rothstein & Ebenstein LLP
90 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10016

cmacedo@arelaw.com
2123368000
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
Charles E. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Leichtman Law PLLC
3 Park Avenue, 15th Floor
New York, NY 10016

charles.miller@cmilleriplaw.com
212-419-5210
Party name: The Association of Amicus Counsel

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543