Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1306 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1306 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Fred Anderson, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:April 16, 2019
Linked with 18A782
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC18-175)
   Decision Date:October 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 14, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 25 2019Application (18A782) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 12, 2019 to April 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Application (18A782) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until April 13, 2019.
Apr 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 16, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 16, 2019 to July 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2019.
May 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Florida Center for Capital Representation at FIU College of Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 16 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 16 2019Brief amici curiae of Retired Florida Judges and Jurists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2019 to August 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 15, 2019.
Aug 15 2019Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 04 2019Reply of petitioner Fred Anderson Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Reynolds v. Florida, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5891
Party name: Fred Anderson Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: State of Florida
Other
Keith Bradley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (U.S.) LLP
1801 California Street, Suite 4900
Denver, CO 80202

keith.bradley@squirepb.com
303-894-6156
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
One Liberty Place
1650 Market Street, Suite 5000
Philadelphia, PA 19109

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-656-3300
Party name: Retired Florida Judges and Jurists
Kristen M. Fiore
    Counsel of Record
Akerman LLP
106 East College Avenue
Suite 1200
Tallahassee, FL 32301

kristen.fiore@akerman.com
8502249634
Party name: Florida Center for Capital Representation at FIU College of Law, Florida Assn. of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Florida Assn. of Public Defenders, Florida Assn. of Criminal Defense Lawyers (Miami-Dade Chapter)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543