Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1297
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1297
Title:New Doe Child #1, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:April 12, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4440)
   Decision Date:August 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 26, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountOtherOtherProof of Service
May 13 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
May 29 2019Supplemental brief of petitioners New Doe Child #1, et al. filed. (Distributed)(6/5/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOtherOther
Jun 10 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael A. Newdow
    Counsel of Record
Newdow Law
PO Box 248
Nice, CA 95464

NewdowLaw@gmail.com
916-273-3798
Party name: New Doe Child #1, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543