Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1289
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1289
Title:Allergan, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.
Docketed:April 10, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1130)
   Decision Date:November 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 07 2019Waiver of right of respondent Akorn, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 07 2019Waiver of right of respondents Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Mylan, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 07 2019Waiver of right of respondent Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan E. Singer
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson, P.C., P.A.
12390 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA 92130

singer@fr.com
858-678-5070
Party name: Allergan, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Douglas H Carsten
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
12235 El Camino Real
San Diego, CA 92130

dcarsten@wsgr.com
8583502305
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Mylan, Inc.
Michael R. Dzwonczyk
    Counsel of Record
Sughrue Mion, PLLC
2100 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20037

mdzwonczyk@sughrue.com
202-293-7060
Party name: Akorn, Inc.
John Christohper Rozendaal
    Counsel of Record
STERNE, KESSLER, GOLDSTEIN & Fox P.L.L.C.
1100 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jcrozendaal@sternekessler.com
2027728747
Party name: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543