Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1287
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1287
Title:Alexander L. Baxter, Petitioner
v.
Brad Bracey, et al.
Docketed:April 10, 2019
Linked with 18A756
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5102)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2019Application (18A756) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2019 to April 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Application (18A756) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until April 8, 2019.
Apr 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 10, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 17 2019Waiver of right of respondents Brad Bracey, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 01 2019Response Requested. (Due May 31, 2019)
May 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2019 to July 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 1, 2019.
May 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Brief amici curiae of Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Brief of respondents Brad Bracey, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2019Reply of petitioner Alexander L. Baxter filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 23 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 08 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 15 2019Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott Michelman
    Counsel of Record
ACLU of the District of Columbia
915 15th St NW 2nd Floor
Washington, DC 20005

smichelman@acludc.org
202-457-0800
Party name: Alexander L. Baxter
Attorneys for Respondents
Melissa Sue Roberge
    Counsel of Record
Department of Law - Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County
Metropolitan Courthouse, Suite 108, PO Box 196300
Nashville, TN 37219

melissa.roberge@nashville.gov
615-862-6341
Party name: Brad Bracey, et al.
Other
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Legal Scholars
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Cross-Ideological Groups Dedicated to Ensuring Official Accountability, Restoring the Public's Trust in Law Enforcement, and Promoting the Rule of Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543