Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1285
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1285
Title:Gilbert P. Hyatt, et al., Petitioners
v.
Andrei Iancu, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:April 10, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1722)
   Decision Date:September 24, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 10 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 10, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2019 to June 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2019.
May 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Raymond A. Mercado, Ph.D. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
May 10 2019Brief amici curiae of U.S. Inventor Small Business Technology Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2019 to July 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 10, 2019.
Jul 10 2019Brief of respondent Iancu, Andrei, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 24 2019Reply of petitioners Gilbert P. Hyatt, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Gilbert P. Hyatt, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Iancu, Andrei
Other
Paul Douglas Kamenar
    Counsel of Record
1629 K Street, N.W. Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

paul.kamenar@gmail.com
202-603-5397
Party name: Raymond A. Mercado, Ph.D.
Maura Kathleen Moran
    Counsel of Record
Cambridge Technology Law, LLC
686 Massachusetts Avenue
Suite 201
Cambridge, MA 02139

mmoran@cambridgetechlaw.com
6464729737
Party name: U.S. Inventor Small Business Technology Council, Orbital Research Inc., and Cleveland Medical Devices Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543