Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1280
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1280
Title:Acorda Therapeutics, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Roxane Laboratories, Inc., et al.
Docketed:April 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2078, 2017-2134)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 8, 2019 to June 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 7, 2019, for all respondents.
May 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Allergan, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Biotechnology Innovation Organization filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Boston Patent Law Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Brief of respondents Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2019Reply of petitioner Acorda Therapeutics, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore B. Olson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

tolson@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8668
Party name: Acorda Therapeutics, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Dan L. Bagatell
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
3 Weatherby Road
Hanover, NH 03755

dbagatell@perkinscoie.com
6023518250
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Charles Bennett Klein
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
1700 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

cklein@winston.com
202-282-5977
Party name: Roxane Laboratories, Inc., and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Other
Paul H. Berghoff
    Counsel of Record
McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff, LLP
300 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

berghoff@mbhb.com
312-913-2140
Party name: INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Sarah Michelle Harris
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

sharris@wc.com
202-434-5599
Party name: Allergan, Inc., Helsinn Healthcare S.A., Breas Medical AB, Akebia Therapeutics, Inc., Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Adamas Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Charles Edmund Lipsey
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett and Dunner
2 Freedom Square
11955 Freedom Drive
Reston, VA 20190

charles.lipsey@finnegan.com
5712032700
Party name: Biotechnology Innovation Organization
Sophie Feifei Wang
    Counsel of Record
Choate Hall & Stewart LLP
Two International Place
Boston, MA 02110

swang@choate.com
6172485000
Party name: Boston Patent Law Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543