Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1261
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1261
Title:Comanche Nation of Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Ryan Zinke, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Docketed:April 2, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-6247)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 2, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
May 02 2019Waiver of right of respondent Ryan Zinke, Sec. of Interior, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard James Grellner
    Counsel of Record
RJG LAW PLLC
434 NW 18TH
Oklahoma City, OK 73103

rjgrellner@hotmail.com
(405) 834-8484
Party name: Comanche Nation of Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Ryan Zinke, Sec. of Interior, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543