Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1245
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1245
Title:Oglala Sioux Tribe, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lisa Fleming, in Her Official Capacity, et al.
Docketed:March 26, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1135, 17-1136, 17-1137)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 25, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent Mark Vargo to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent Honorable Craig Pfeifle to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 22 2019Waiver of right of respondents Lisa Fleming, in her official capacity as Regional Manager of Region 1 of South Dakota Department of Social Services, and M. Michael DeSautel, in his official capacity as Secretary of the South Dakota Department of Social Services to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 08 2019Response Requested. (Due June 7, 2019)
May 30 2019Motion of Mark Vargo to extend the time to file a response from June 7, 2019 to June 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 30 2019Motion of Craig Pfeifle to extend the time to file a response from June 7, 2019 to June 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 30 2019Motion of Lisa Fleming, et al. to extend the time to file a response from June 7, 2019 to June 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 03 2019The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2019, for all respondents.
Jun 27 2019Brief of respondents Lisa Fleming, in Her Official Capacity, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 22 2019Reply of petitioners Oglala Sioux Tribe, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2019Letter of petitioners Oglala Sioux Tribe, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen L Pevar
    Counsel of Record
ACLU
765 Asylum Avenue
Harford, CT 06106

spevar@aclu.org
8605709830
Party name: Oglala Sioux Tribe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey G. Hurd
    Counsel of Record
Bangs, McCullen, et al.
333 West Boulevard
Suite 400
Rapid City, SD 57701

jhurd@bangsmccullen.com
6053906773
Party name: Honorable Craig Pfeifle
Robert Lyle Morris II
    Counsel of Record
Morris Law Firm, Prof. LLC
PO Box 370
Belle Fourche, SD 57717

bobmorris@westriverlaw.com
605-723-7777
Party name: Lisa Fleming, in her official capacity, et al.
J. Crisman Palmer
    Counsel of Record
Gunderson Palmer Nelson & Ashmore, LLP
506 6th Street
P.O. Box 8045
Rapid City, SD 57709-8045

cpalmer@gpna.com
605-342-1078
Party name: Mark Vargo

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543