Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1239
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1239
Title:Havasupai Tribe, Petitioner
v.
Heather C. Provencio, et al.
Docketed:March 25, 2019
Linked with 18A694
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15857, 15-15754)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 26 2018Application (18A694) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2019 to March 24, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Jan 03 2019Application (18A694) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 24, 2019.
Mar 21 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2019Waiver of right of respondent Provencio, Heather, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2019Waiver of right of respondents Energy Fuels Resources (USA) Inc., EFR Arizona Strip LLC, Intervenors-Defendants-Appellees to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard W Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Rothstein Donatelli, LLP
1215 Paseo de Peralta
Santa Fe, NM 87501

rwhughes@rothsteinlaw.com
505-988-8004
Party name: HAVASUPAI TRIBE
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Provencio, Heather, et al.
Michael K. Kennedy
    Counsel of Record
Gallagher & Kennedy
2575 East Camelback Road
Phoenix, AZ 85016

mkk@gknet.com
602-530-8504
Party name: Energy Fuels Resources (USA) Inc., EFR Arizona Strip LLC, Intervenors-Defendants-Appellees

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543