Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1233
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1233
Title:Romag Fasteners, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Fossil, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2417)
   Decision Date:February 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 22, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Romag Fasteners, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to May 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2019.
May 22 2019Brief of respondents Fossil, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 30 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Reply of petitioner Romag Fasteners, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 17 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 13, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including November 26, 2019.
Aug 12 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Romag Fasteners, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Aug 19 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Fossil, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Sep 13 2019Brief of petitioner Romag Fasteners, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 13 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of The American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of International Trademark Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2019Motion for a further extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 14, 2020.
Nov 20 2019Motion to further extend the time to file respondents' brief on the merits is granted, and the time is extended to and including November 27, 2019.
Nov 26 2019CIRCULATED
Nov 27 2019Brief of respondents Fossil, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Amicus brief of Intellectual Property Law Professors submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: Romag Fasteners, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Fossil, Inc., et al.
Jeffrey Evan DuplerGibney, Anthony & Flaherty, LLP
665 5th Avenue
New York, NY 10022

jdupler@gibney.com
212-688-5151
Party name: Fossil, Inc., et al.
Other
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Professors
Paul H. Berghoff
    Counsel of Record
McDonnell Boehnen Hulbert & Berghoff, LLP
300 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

berghoff@mbhb.com
312-913-0001
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
Patrick Grady Burns
    Counsel of Record
Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.
300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500
Chicago, IL 60606

pburns@gbc.law
312-987-4001
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
Kirsten Elizabeth Donaldson
    Counsel of Record
Gray, Plant, Mooty, Mooty & Bennett, P.A.
80 S. Eighth Street
Suite 500
Minneapolis, MN 55402

kirsten.donaldson07@gmail.com
612-632-3461
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Judy Perry Martinez
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60610

AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Lawrence K. Nodine
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr, LLP
999 Peachtree St., Suite 1000
Atlanta, GA 30309

nodinel@ballardspahr.com
(678) 420-9300
Party name: International Trademark Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543