SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-123
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-123
Title:
In Re Citizens for Fair Representation, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:
July 27, 2018
Lower Ct:
Case Numbers:
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2018
Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due August 27, 2018)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Aug 08 2018
Waiver of right of respondent Alex Padilla to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott Erik Stafne
Counsel of Record
Stafne Law Advocacy & Consulting
239 N. Olympic Avenue
Arlington, WA 98223
scott@stafnelaw.com
3604038700
Party name: Citizens for Fair Representation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
George Waters
Counsel of Record
Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814
George.Waters@doj.ca.gov
9162106059
Party name: Alex Padilla
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##