SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-1223
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-1223
Title:
Mario Villena, et al., Petitioners
v.
Andrei Iancu, Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:
March 20, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2017-2069)
Decision Date:
August 29, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
October 31, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jan 28 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 19, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 09 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 19, 2019 to May 20, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 20, 2019.
Apr 19 2019
Brief amicus curiae of Jeremy C. Doerre in support of neither party filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 09 2019
Brief of respondent Iancu, Andrei, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 17 2019
Reply of petitioners Mario Villena, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 21 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019
Petition DENIED.
Jul 03 2019
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jul 11 2019
DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 05 2019
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Burman York Mathis Jr.
Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Burman Y. Mathis
471 Riverside Dr.
Harpers Ferry, WV 25425
budmathis@yahoo.com
703 901 1683
Party name: Mario Villena, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Iancu, Andrei
Other
Jeremy Cooper Doerre
Counsel of Record
Tillman Wright, PLLC
11325 N. Community House Road, Suite 250
Charlotte, NC 28277
jdoerre@ti-law.com
7042484883
Party name: Jeremy C. Doerre
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##