Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1214
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1214
Title:Wilbur L. Ross, Secretary of Commerce, et al., Petitioners
v.
California, et al.
Docketed:March 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15456, 19-15457)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due April 17, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceProof of Service
Mar 19 2019Motion to expedite consideration filed by respondents California et al.
Main DocumentMain Document
Mar 20 2019Brief of respondents City of San Jose; Black Alliance for Just Immigration in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 21 2019Amicus brief of Fair Lines America Foundation not accepted for filing. (April 03, 2019)
Mar 21 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Fair Lines America Foundation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountOtherProof of Service
Apr 05 2019Response to petition from respondents State of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Fair Lines America Foundation GRANTED.
Jun 28 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Department of Commerce v. New York, 588 U. S. ___ (2019).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Wilbur L. Ross, Secretary of Commerce, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John F. Libby
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
11355 West Olympic Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90064

jlibby@manatt.com
310-312-4000
Party name: City of San Jose; Black Alliance for Just Immigration
Michael James Mongan
    Counsel of Record
State of CA, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3920
Party name: State of California
Other
Charles Herbert Bell Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Bell, McAndrews & Hiltachk
455 Capitol Mall, Suite 600
Sacramento, CA 95814

cbell@bmhlaw.com
9164427757
Party name: Fair Lines America Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543