Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-121
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-121
Title:James Rothery, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lou Blanas, et al.
Docketed:July 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(09-16852)
   Decision Date:November 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 27, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Waiver of right of respondent Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 14 2018Waiver of right of respondents Lou Blanas, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 31 2018Response Requested. (Due October 1, 2018)
Oct 01 2018Brief of State Respondent in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Brief of respondents County of Sacramento, et al. in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 09 2018Reply of petitioners James Rothery, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gary W. Gorski
    Counsel of Record
3017 Douglas Blvd. Suite 150
Roseville, CA 95661

CivilRightsAttorney@outlook.com
(775) 720-1000
Party name: James Rothery, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
John Andrej Lavra
    Counsel of Record
Longyear, O'dea and Lavra, LLP
3620 American River Drive
Suite 230
Sacramento, CA 95864

lavra@longyearlaw.com
916-974-8500
Party name: Lou Blanas, et al.
Samuel Passchier Siegel
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

sam.siegel@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-6269
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543