Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1203
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1203
Title:Courthouse News Service, Petitioner
v.
Dorothy Brown, Clerk, Circuit Court of Illinois, Cook County
Docketed:March 15, 2019
Linked with 18A763
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1230)
   Decision Date:November 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2019Application (18A763) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 11, 2019 to March 13, 2019, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 25 2019Application (18A763) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until March 13, 2019.
Mar 13 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent Dorothy Brown, Clerk, Circuit Court of Illinois, Cook County to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 24 2019Response Requested. (Due May 24, 2019)
May 24 2019Brief of respondent Dorothy Brown, Clerk, Circuit Court of Illinois, Cook County in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2019Reply of petitioner Courthouse News Service filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kenneth Lee Marshall
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
211 N. Broadway
Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO 63102

klmarshall@bclplaw.com
314-259-2000
Party name: Courthouse News Service
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Anthony Castiglione
    Counsel of Record
Cook County State's Attorney's Office
500 Richard J. Daley Center
Chicago, IL 60602

paul.castiglione@cookcountyil.gov
(312) 603-2350
Party name: Dorothy Brown, Clerk, Circuit Court of Illinois, Cook County

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543