Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1189
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1189
Vide 18-893
Title:Mitch Carmichael, President of the West Virginia Senate, et al., Petitioners
v.
West Virginia, ex rel. Margaret L. Workman
Docketed:March 13, 2019
Linked with 18A677
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia
   Case Numbers:(18-0816)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2018Application (18A677) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 9, 2019 to March 10, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Application (18A677) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 10, 2019.
Mar 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Apr 11 2019Waiver of right of respondents West Virginia, ex. rel. Margaret Workman to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 24 2019Response Requested. (Due May 24, 2019)
May 24 2019Brief of respondent West Virginia, ex. rel. Margaret Workman in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 10 2019Reply of petitioners Mitch Carmichael, President of the West Virginia Senate, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: Mitch Carmichael, President of the West Virginia Senate, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Marc Ellis Williams
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
949 Third Avenue, Suite 200
Huntington, WV 25701

marc.williams@nelsonmullins.com
304-526-3501
Party name: West Virginia, ex. rel. Margaret Workman

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543