Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1185
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1185
Title:Charter Communications, Inc., Petitioner
v.
National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al.
Docketed:March 13, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55723)
   Decision Date:February 4, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 12, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Brief of respondents National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2019Reply of petitioner Charter Communications, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 15 2019Rescheduled.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Charter Communications, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: National Association of African American-Owned Media, et al.
Other
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543