Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1170
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1170
Title:Xitronix Corporation, Petitioner
v.
KLA-Tencor Corporation, dba KLA-Tencor, Incorporated
Docketed:March 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-50114)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 8, 2019.
Mar 21 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Xitronix Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 10 2019Letter of petitioner dated May 10, 2019, received.
Main Document
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 23 2019Letter of petitioner dated May 23, 2019, received.
Main Document
May 24 2019Response Requested. (Due June 24, 2019)
Jun 24 2019Brief of respondent KLA-Tencor Corporation, DBA KLA-Tencor, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 10 2019Reply of petitioner Xitronix Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2019Rescheduled.
Sep 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Xitronix Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Aaron Gabriel Fountain
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
401 Congress Avenue, Ste 2500
Austin, TX 78701

aaron.fountain@us.dlapiper.com
5124577190
Party name: KLA-Tencor Corporation, DBA KLA-Tencor, Inc.
James M. HeintzDLA Piper LLP (US)
One Fountain Square
11911 Freedom Drive, Suite 300
Reston, VA 20190-5602

jim.heintz@dlapiper.com
703.773.4148
Party name: KLA-Tencor Corporation, DBA KLA-Tencor, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543