Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1162
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1162
Title:P. Swaney, et al., Petitioners
v.
Hector Lopez
Docketed:March 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-16516)
   Decision Date:October 30, 2018
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:December 4, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 07 2019Waiver of right of respondents Hector Lopez, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 07 2019Response Requested. (Due June 6, 2019)
May 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 6, 2019 to July 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 8, 2019.
Jul 08 2019Brief of respondents Hector Lopez, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2019Reply of petitioners P. Swaney, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Andrew George Pappas
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Arizona
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

Andrew.Pappas@azag.gov
602-542-3333
Party name: P. Swaney, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Michael Weeks
    Counsel of Record
Weeks Law Firm PLLC
3839 E. Marshall Gulch Pl.
Tucson, AZ 85718

stephenweeksesq@msn.com
520-331-3669
Party name: Hector Lopez, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543