Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1139
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1139
Title:BNSF Railway Company, Petitioner
v.
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Docketed:March 4, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35457)
   Decision Date:September 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 3, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, BNSF Railway Company.
Blanket Consent
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 3, 2019 to May 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2019.
Apr 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Railroads filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers and the HR Policy Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2019 to June 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 3, 2019.
May 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2019 to July 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 8, 2019.
Jun 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 8, 2019 to August 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 8, 2019.
Aug 08 2019Brief of respondent Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 22 2019Motion for leave to intervene as a respondent and to file a brief in opposition filed by Russell Holt.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 03 2019Response to motion from petitioner BNSF Railway Company filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 06 2019Reply in support of Russell Holt's motion for leave to intervene as a respondent and to file a brief in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Motion of Russell Holt for leave to intervene as a respondent and to file a brief in opposition GRANTED.
Oct 07 2019Brief of Russell Holt in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Oct 23 2019Reply of petitioner BNSF Railway Company filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Supplemental brief of respondent Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 12 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew S. Tulumello
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

atulumello@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8657
Party name: BNSF Railway Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Other
Brian Halligan Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

bfletcher@law.stanford.edu
6507243345
Party name: Russell Holt
Daniel Saphire
    Counsel of Record
Association of Amer. Railroads
425 3rd Street. N.W.
`
Washington, DC 20024

dsaphire@aar.org
202-639-2505
Party name: Association of American Railroads
Maurice Baskin
    Counsel of Record
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
815 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

mbaskin@littler.com
202-842-3400
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers and the HR Policy Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543