SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-1134
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-1134
Title:
Virginia House of Delegates, et al., Appellants
v.
Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Docketed:
March 1, 2019
Lower Ct:
United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Case Numbers:
(3:14cv852)
Decision Date:
February 14, 2019
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2019
Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due April 1, 2019)
Jurisdictional Statement
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 15 2019
Brief amicus curiae of National Republican Redistricting Trust filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 15 2019
Brief amicus curiae of Fair Lines America Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 01 2019
Motion to dismiss filed by appellees Virginia State Board of Elections, et al.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 01 2019
Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 15 2019
Opposition to motions to dismiss or affirm of appellants Virginia House of Delegates, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Apr 17 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Jun 17 2019
Appeal dismissed for want of jurisdiction. See Virginia House of Delegates v. Bethune-Hill, No. 18-281, 587 U. S. ___ (2019).
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Efrem M. Braden
Counsel of Record
Baker &Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue NW
Suite1100
Washington, DC 20036
mbraden@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1500
Party name: Virginia House of Delegates, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Marc Erik Elias
Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960
melias@perkinscoie.com
202-654-6200
Party name: Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Toby Jay Heytens
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219
SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Virginia State Board of Elections, James B. Alcorn, Virginia Department of Elections, Christopher E. Piper, Clara Belle Wheeler, Singleton B. McAllister
Other
Jason Brett Torchinsky
Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186
jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: National Republican Redistricting Trust
Bryan Paul Tyson
Counsel of Record
Taylor English Duma LLP
1600 Parkwood Circle
Suite 200
Atlanta, GA 30339
btyson@taylorenglish.com
770-434-6868
Party name: Fair Lines America Foundation, Inc.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##