SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-1083
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-1083
Title:
Garda CL Northwest, Inc., fka AT Systems, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Lawrence Hill, et al.
Docketed:
February 21, 2019
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Washington
Case Numbers:
(94593-4)
Decision Date:
August 23, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
November 20, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2019
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2019)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 15 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2019 to April 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 18 2019
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2019.
Apr 24 2019
Brief of respondents Lawrence Hill, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 08 2019
Reply of petitioner Garda CL Northwest, Inc. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 14 2019
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Fred Anthony Rowley
Counsel of Record
Munger Tolles & OLson, LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
Fiftieth Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071
fred.rowley@mto.com
2136839100
Party name: Garda CL Northwest, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott Lawrence Nelson
Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009
snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Lawrence Hill, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##