Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1081
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1081
Title:Curtiss Wilson, Petitioner
v.
Horton's Towing, et al.
Docketed:February 21, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-35320)
   Decision Date:October 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 16, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019Waiver of right of respondent Horton's Towing to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Joseph Johnston
    Counsel of Record
401 Central Avenue
Bellingham, WA 98225

wjtj47@gmail.com
360-676-1931
Party name: Curtiss Wilson
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Robert W. NovaskyForsberg & Umlauf, P.S.
1102 Broadway, Suite 510
Tacoma, WA 98402

253-572-4200
Party name: Horton's Towing

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543