Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1073
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1073
Title:Tara King, et al., Petitioners
v.
Phil Murphy, Governor of New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:February 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-4429)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 13, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2019Waiver of right of respondents Governer of New Jersey, Chris Christie, Eric T. Kanefsky, Milagros Collazo, J. Michael Walker, and Paul Jordan to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 26 2019Waiver of right of respondent Garden State Equality to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
LIBERTY COUNSEL
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

mat@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Tara King, Ph.D., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David Scott Flugman
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay, PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
17th Floor
New York, NY 10104

dflugman@selendygay.com
212-390-9000
Party name: Garden State Equality
Susan Marie Scott
    Counsel of Record
New Jersey Department of Law and Public SafetyDi
R.J. Hughes Justice Complex
25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112
Trenton, NJ 08725-0112

susan.scott@law.njoag.gov
609-376-2955
Party name: Governer of New Jersey, Chris Christie, Eric T. Kanefsky, Milagros Collazo, J. Michael Walker, and Paul Jordan

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543