Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1067
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1067
Title:Ambac Assurance Corporation, Petitioner
v.
U.S. Bank National Association
Docketed:February 14, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Minnesota
   Case Numbers:(A18-0043)
   Decision Date:September 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 13, 2018

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 18, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Amended Rule 29.6 Corporate Disclosure Statement received from Petitioner Ambac Assurance Corporation.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Waiver of right of respondent U.S. Bank National Association to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Mar 21 2019Response Requested. (Due April 22, 2019)
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2019 to June 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2019.
May 22 2019Brief of respondent U.S. Bank National Association in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 23 2019Rule 29.6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed with respect to brief in opposition of respondent U.S. Bank National Association.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 05 2019Reply of petitioner Ambac Assurance Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: Ambac Assurance Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Traci L. Lovitt
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
100 High Street
21st Floor
Boston, MA 02110

tlovitt@jonesday.com
(617) 449-6900
Party name: U.S. Bank National Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543