Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1062
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1062
Title:Love Terminal Partners, L.P., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:February 13, 2019
Linked with 18A460
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2276)
   Decision Date:May 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2018Application (18A460) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 11, 2018 to January 10, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 01 2018Application (18A460) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 10, 2019.
Dec 13 2018Application (18A460) to extend further the time from January 10, 2019 to February 9, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Application (18A460) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 9, 2019.
Feb 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Love Terminal Partners, L.P., et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2019 to April 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2019.
Mar 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 15 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief amici curiae of NFIB Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of JetBlue Airways Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2019 to May 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 15, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Love Terminal Partners, L.P., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Dana Berliner
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

dberliner@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: States of Texas, Arkansas, Oklahoma, and Utah
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
255 S. King Street
Seattle, WA 98134

bth@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Elizabeth Petrela Papez
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

epapez@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8608
Party name: JetBlue Airways Corporation
John L. Runft
    Counsel of Record
Runft and Steele Law Offices, PLLC
1020 W. Main
Suite 400
Boise, ID 83702

jrunft@runftsteele.com
208-333-8506
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Luke Anthony Wake
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

luke.wake@nfib.org
202-314-2061
Party name: NFIB Small Business Legal Center, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543