Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1048
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1048
Title:GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS, Corp., fka Converteam SAS, Petitioner
v.
Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, et al.
Docketed:February 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10944)
   Decision Date:August 30, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 13, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Waiver of right of respondents Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC
Blanket Consent
Mar 13 2019Waiver of right of respondents Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Mar 28 2019Response Requested. (Due April 29, 2019)
Apr 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2019 to May 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended for all respondents to and including May 21, 2019.
May 21 2019Brief of Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC in opposition not accepted for filing. (May 30, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
May 21 2019Brief of respondents Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.(5/30/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 04 2019Reply of petitioner GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS, Corp. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 17 2019Joint motion for an extension of time within which to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 19 2019Joint motion for an extension of time within which to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 17, 2019. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including November 22, 2019.
Sep 17 2019Brief of petitioner GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS, Corp. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of The North America Branch of the Chartered Institute of Arbitrators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 24 2019Brief amici curiae of Professor George A. Bermann, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of the Miami International Arbitration Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 21, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: GE Energy Power Conversion France SAS, Corp.
Attorneys for Respondents
Melinda S. Kollross
    Counsel of Record
Clausen Miller P.C.
10 South LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL 60603

mkollross@clausen.com
3126067608
Party name: Sompo Japan Insurance Company of America, et al.
Eddie Travis Ramey
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
420 North 20th Street, Wells Fargo Tower, Suite 3400
Birmingham, AL 35203

tramey@burr.com
205-251-3000
Party name: Outokumpu Stainless USA, LLC
Other
Douglass W. Cassel
    Counsel of Record
KING & SPALDING LLP
1185 Avenue of the Americas
35th Floor
New York, NY 10036

Dcassel@kslaw.com
2125562361
Party name: Professor George A. Bermann et al.
Carlos Francisco Concepcion
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon
201 S. Biscayne Blvd.
Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131

cconcepcion@shb.com
(305) 358-5171
Party name: THE MIAMI INTERNATIONAL ARBITRATION SOCIETY
John Michael Connolly
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

mike@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Karla Gilbride
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice, P.C.
1620 L Street NW, Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

kgilbride@publicjustice.net
202-797-8600
Party name: PUBLIC JUSTICE
Glenn P. Hendrix
    Counsel of Record
Arnall Golden Gregory LLP
171 17th St NW
Suite 2100
Atlanta, GA 30363

glenn.hendrix@agg.com
404-873-8692
Party name: The North America Branch of the Chartered Institute of Arbitrators
Peter Bowman Rutledge
    Counsel of Record
215 Morton Avenue
Athens, GA 30605

borutledge70@gmail.com
706 542 7140
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543