Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A795
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A795
Title:Michael C. Turzai, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, et al., Applicants
v.
League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:January 26, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(J-1-2018)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2018Application (17A795) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jan 29 2018Letter of applicants Michael C. Turzai, et al. received.
Jan 29 2018Response to application (17A795) requested by Justice Alito, due Friday, February 2, by 4 p.m. ET.
Jan 29 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Secretary of State of Alabama, et al.
Main Document
Jan 29 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Republican Party of Pennsylvania.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Mike Kelly, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Arizona, et al.
Main Document
Feb 02 2018Response to application from respondents League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Response to application from respondent Lieutenant Governor Michael J. Stack, III filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Response to application from respondents Governor Thomas W. Wolf, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Response to application from respondents Brian McCann, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 03 2018Reply of applicants Michael C. Turzai, et al. filed.
Reply
Feb 05 2018Application (17A795) denied by Justice Alito.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Michael C. Turzai, in his capacity as Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, and Joseph B. Scarnati III, in his capacity as Pennsylvania Senate President Pro Tempore
Attorneys for Respondents
Clifford Benjamin Levine
    Counsel of Record
Cohen & Grigsby, P.C.
625 Liberty Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

clevine@cohenlaw.com
412-297-4998
Party name: Lieutenant Governor Michael J. Stack III
Mark A. Aronchick
    Counsel of Record
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

maa@hangley.com
215-496-7002
Party name: Thomas W. Wolf, Robert Torres, Jonathan Marks
Jeffrey S. Batoff
    Counsel of Record
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell and Hippel LLP
1500 Market Street
Suite 3400
Philadelphia, PA 19102

jeffrey.batoff@obermayer.com
215-665-3026
Party name: Brian McCann et. al.
Elisabeth Susan Theodore
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

elisabeth.theodore@apks.com
202-942-5891
Party name: League of Women Voters of Pennsylvania, et al.
Other
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
7038888329
Party name: Secretaries of State of Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Kansas, Missouri, and South Carolina
Joel L. Frank
    Counsel of Record
Lamb McErlane PC
24 E. Market Street
P.O. Box 565
West Chester, PA 19380

jfrank@lambmcerlane.com
610-430-8000
Party name: Republican Party of Pennsylvania
Matthew Herman Haverstick
    Counsel of Record
Kleinbard LLC
One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St.
46th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mhaverstick@kleinbard.com
(215) 568-2000
Party name: Mike Kelly, et al.
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Louisiana Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: States of AZ, KS, LA, MI, MO, SC, TX, UT and NC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543