Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A790
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A790
Title:North Carolina, et al., Applicants
v.
Sandra Little Covington, et al.
Docketed:January 24, 2018
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:15CV399)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2018Application (17A790) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 25 2018Response to application (17A790) requested by The Chief Justice, due Friday, February 2, by noon ET.
Feb 02 2018Response to application from respondents Sandra Little Covington, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by Secretary of State of Alabama, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Civil Rights Union.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 05 2018Reply of applicants North Carolina, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Feb 06 2018Application (17A790) referred to the Court.
Feb 06 2018The application (17A790) for a stay presented to the Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted in part and denied in part. The District Court’s order of January 21, 2018, insofar as it directs the revision of House districts in Wake County and Mecklenburg County, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal in this Court. Justice Thomas and Justice Alito would grant the application for a stay in its entirety. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application for a stay in its entirety.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: State of North Carolina, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: Sandra Little Covington, et al.
Other
Christopher Elliott Skinnell
    Counsel of Record
Nielsen Merksamer Parrinello Gross & Leoni, LLP
2350 Kerner Boulevard
Suite 250
San Rafael, CA 94901

cskinnell@nmgovlaw.com
415-389-6800
Party name: Secretaries of State of the States of Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, and West Virginia
Scott Eric Gessler
    Counsel of Record
Klenda Gessler & Blue LLC
1624 Market Street
Suite 202
Denver, CO 80202

sgessler@klendagesslerblue.com
720-432-5705
Party name: American Civil Rights Union

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543