Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A735
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A735
Title:Martins Beach 1, LLC, et al., Applicants
v.
Surfrider Foundation
Docketed:January 11, 2018
Linked with 17-1198
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A144268, A145176)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2018Application (17A735) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2019 to February 22, 2019, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Application (17A735) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 22, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2028795000
Party name: Martins Beach 1, LLC and Martins Beach 2, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543