Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A649
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A649
Title:Harvest Family Church, et al., Applicants
v.
Federal Emergency Management Agency, et al.
Docketed:December 18, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-20768)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2017Application (17A649) for injunctive relief pending appeal, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceOther
Dec 21 2017Response to application requested. (Due January 10, 2018, by 3 p.m. ET)
Jan 03 2018Letter of respondents Federal Emergency Management Agency, et al. received.
Jan 04 2018Application (17A649) withdrawn.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: Harvest Family Church, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Emergency Management Agency, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543