Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A560
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A560
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Applicants
v.
International Refugee Assistance Project, et al.
Docketed:November 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(8:17-cv-00361-TDC)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2017Application (17A560) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 21 2017Response to application due on or before 12 p.m., Tuesday, November 28, 2017.
Nov 28 2017Response to application from respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 30 2017Reply of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Dec 04 2017Letter of respondents International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. received. (Distributed)
Dec 04 2017Application (17A560) referred to the Court.
Dec 04 2017Application (17A560) granted by the Court. The application for a stay presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the District Court’s October 17, 2017 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the Government’s appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit and disposition of the Government’s petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is sought. If a writ of certiorari is sought and the Court denies the petition, this order shall terminate automatically. If the Court grants the petition for a writ of certiorari, this order shall terminate when the Court enters its judgment. In light of its decision to consider the case on an expedited basis, we expect that the Court of Appeals will render its decision with appropriate dispatch. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Donald Trump, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Omar Cassim Jadwat
    Counsel of Record
ACLU Foundation
125 Broad Street
18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

ojadwat@aclu.org
2125492620
Party name: International Refugee Assistance Project, et al., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543