Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A559
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A559
Title:Ross William Ulbricht, aka Dread Pirate Roberts, aka Silk Road, Applicant
v.
United States of America
Docketed:November 20, 2017
Linked with 17-950
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1815-cr)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2017Application (17A559) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2017 to December 28, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Application (17A559) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until December 28, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon Kumar Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Ross William Ulbricht
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543