Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A550
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A550
Title:Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Applicants
v.
Hawaii, et al.
Docketed:November 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-17168)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2017Application (17A550) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 21 2017Response to application due on or before 12 p.m., Tuesday, November 28, 2017.
Nov 22 2017Motion (17A550) for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by the State of Texas, et al.
Main DocumentOther
Nov 28 2017Response to application from respondents Hawaii, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 28 2017Motion (17A550) for leave to file amici brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by the State of New York, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2017Reply of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Dec 04 2017Application (17A550) referred to the Court.
Dec 04 2017Application (17A550) granted by the Court. The application for a stay presented to Justice Kennedy and by him referred to the Court is granted, and the District Court’s October 20, 2017 order granting a preliminary injunction is stayed pending disposition of the Government’s appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of the Government’s petition for a writ of certiorari, if such writ is sought. If a writ of certiorari is sought and the Court denies the petition, this order shall terminate automatically. If the Court grants the petition for a writ of certiorari, this order shall terminate when the Court enters its judgment. In light of its decision to consider the case on an expedited basis, we expect that the Court of Appeals will render its decision with appropriate dispatch. Justice Ginsburg and Justice Sotomayor would deny the application.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: DONALD TRUMP, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: STATE OF HAWAII, et al.
Other
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512.936.1700
Party name: States of Texas, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Kansas, Louisiana, Missouri, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and West Virginia as Amici Curiae
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway
New York, NY 10271-0332

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of New York, California, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and Washington, and the District of Columbia

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543