Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A415
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A415
Title:Torie A. Cash, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:October 16, 2017
Linked with 17-840
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
   Case Numbers:(17-0376/AR, 17-0041/AR)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2017Application (17A415) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 23, 2017 to December 22, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 18 2017Application (17A415) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 22, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mary Jeanne Bradley
    Counsel of Record
United States Army Legal Services Agency
9275 Gunston Road
Fort Belvoir, VA 22060

mary.j.bradley2.mil@mail.mil
(703) 693-0647
Party name: Torie A. Cash

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543