Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A245
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17A245
Title:Greg Abbott, Governor of Texas, et al., Applicants
v.
Shannon Perez, et al.
Docketed:August 31, 2017
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Texas
   Case Numbers:(SA-11-CV-360)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2017Application (17A245) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to Justice Alito.
Aug 31 2017IT IS ORDERED that the order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, case No. SA-11-CV-360, entered August 24, 2017, is hereby stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Thursday, September 7, 2017, by 3 p.m., and further order of Justice Alito or of the Court.
Sep 01 2017Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief and motion for leave to file brief in compliance with Rule 33.2 filed by the States of Louisiana, et al.
Sep 07 2017Response to application from respondents Shannon Perez, et al. filed.
Sep 08 2017Reply of applicants Greg Abbott, et al. filed.
Sep 12 2017Application (17A245) referred to the Court.
Sep 12 2017Application (17A245) granted by the Court. The application for stay presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is granted, and it is ordered that the order of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, case No. SA-11-CV-360, entered August 24, 2017, is stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of an appeal to this Court. Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application.
Sep 15 2017Letter from counsel for respondents received.
Sep 25 2017Respondents’ letter to the Clerk, dated September 15, 2017, is construed as a motion and denied.
Jan 18 2018Motion of American Civil Rights Union for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (January 18, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott A Keller
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

skeller@yettercoleman.com
512-936-1700
Party name: Greg Abbott, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Allison J. Riggs
    Counsel of Record
Southern Coalition for Social Justice
1415 West Highway 54, Suite 101
Durham, NC 27707

AllisonRiggs@southerncoalition.org
(919) 323-3942
Party name: Shannon Perez, et al.
Other
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
(225)-326-6766
Party name: The States of Louisiana, et al.
Scott Eric Gessler
    Counsel of Record
Klenda Gessler & Blue LLC
1624 Market Street
Suite 202
Denver, CO 80202

sgessler@klendagesslerblue.com
720-432-5705
Party name: American Civil Rights Union

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543