Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17A101
RSS Feed Print
No. 17A101
Title:Securities and Exchange Commission, Applicant
v.
David F. Bandimere
Docketed:July 21, 2017
Linked with 17-475
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-9586)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 21 2017Application (17A101) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 1, 2017 to August 31, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jul 24 2017Application (17A101) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 31, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Application (17A101) to extend further the time from August 31, 2017 to September 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Aug 22 2017Application (17A101) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 29, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543