Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-981
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-981
Title:Theresa Riffey, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bruce Rauner, Governor of Illinois, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3487)
   Decision Date:October 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 9, 2018)
PetitionOther
Jan 25 2018Waiver of right of respondent Governor Bruce Rauner to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 08 2018Waiver of right of respondent Service Employees International Union Healthcare Illinois, Indiana, Missouri, Kansas to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 15 2018Response Requested. (Due March 19, 2018)
Mar 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2018 to May 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 3, 2018, for all respondents.
Apr 11 2018Brief of respondent Governor Bruce Rauner in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
May 03 2018Brief of respondents Service Employees International Union Healthcare Illinois, Indiana, Missouri, Kansas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Reply of petitioners Theresa Riffey, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 06 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Janus v. State, County, and Municipal Employees, 585 U. S. ____ (2018).
Jul 30 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Theresa Riffey, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
David Leigh Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Illinois
100 W. Randolph
12th floor
Chicago, IL 60601

dfranklin@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: Governor Bruce Rauner
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: Service Employees International Union Healthcare Illinois, Indiana, Missouri, Kansas
Frank Henry BieszczatOffice of the Illinois Attorney General
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

fbieszczat@atg.state.il.us
312-814-2234
Party name: Governor Bruce Rauner, et al.
Other
David Morgan Steven DeWhirst
    Counsel of Record
Freedom Foundation
2403 Pacific Avenue, SE
Olympia, WA 98501

ddewhirst@freedomfoundation.com
360-956-3482
Party name: Freedom Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543