Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-97
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-97
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Antwon Jenkins
Docketed:July 19, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-2898)
   Decision Date:February 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 18, 2017)
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 08 2017Response Requested. (Due October 10, 2017)
Sep 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 9, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Brief of respondent Antwon Jenkins in opposition filed.
Nov 28 2017Reply of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Apr 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 19 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 24 2018Supplemental brief of respondent Antwon Jenkins filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Sessions v. Dimaya, 584 U. S. ____ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006-1101

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202)-263-3127
Party name: Antwon Jenkins

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543